This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 01:28:24 (UTC).

HENRY OLIVARES VS FUTUREDONTICS INC

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 HENRY OLIVARES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FUTUREDONTICS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8742

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OLIVARES HENRY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

FUTUREDONTICS INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAWYERS FOR JUSTICE PC

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

JUVINALL KATE ELSA

 

Court Documents

Other -

4/20/2018: Other -

Other -

5/8/2018: Other -

Minute Order

5/15/2018: Minute Order

Other -

5/15/2018: Other -

Other -

5/17/2018: Other -

Stipulation - No Order

6/22/2018: Stipulation - No Order

Other -

8/6/2018: Other -

Stipulation - No Order

8/9/2018: Stipulation - No Order

Motion to Bifurcate

11/16/2018: Motion to Bifurcate

Stipulation and Order

1/7/2019: Stipulation and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/6/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition

5/6/2019: Opposition

Declaration

5/13/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

5/17/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

1/24/2018: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/2/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200, ET SEQ. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/2/2018: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200, ET SEQ. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Henry Olivares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate; Status Conference; Non-Appear...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Reply (ISO its Motion To Bifurcate Class Certification); Filed by Futuredontics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Declaration (of Kate E. Juvinall in support of Defendant's Motion To Bifurcate Class Certification); Filed by Futuredontics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Henry Olivares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Declaration (of Benjamin Haber in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate Class Certification); Filed by Henry Olivares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • Order -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM-CLASS ACTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 308; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • -PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., -170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Henry Olivares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200, ET SEQ. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Henry Olivares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

410 West Arden Avenue, Suite 203 Glendale, California 91203

LAWYERS for JUSTICE, PC

TNI9IH0

\O oo ~] N W = o Do ot

p— O

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA - FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case No.: BC688742

Honorable Elihu M. Berle Department 323

behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated;

Plaintiff, VS.

FUTUREDONTICS, INC., a California corporation; and DOES 1 through 100,

CLASS ACTION

inclusive, PROOF OF SERVICE

'Defendants. |

Complaint Filed: January 2, 2018 - Jury Trial Date: None Set

"~ PROOF OF SERVICE