This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:32:49 (UTC).

HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL VS. SWA ARCHITECTS ET A

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SWA ARCHITECTS ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7774

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CLEAVER-BROOKS

FULTON BOILER WORKS INC.

NALCO COMPANY LLC

D'AUTREMONT-HELM AND ASSOCIATES INC.

PACIFIC NATIONAL GROUP

CHEM PRO LABORATORY INC.

SWA ARCHITECTS

R.F. MACDONALD COMPANY

XCEL MECHANICAL SYSTEMS INC.

DHA + CALPEC

SODEXO INC.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONES DAY

KASSABIAN MARK MIHRAN

MCMILLAN DANIEL DELOS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

STEWART BRIAN KEITH

CRISP KEVIN ROBERT

SONNETT ANTHONY EVAN

CRESPO DANIEL ALFREDO

PARASCANDOLA ANTHONY JOSEPH

DONOVAN WILLIAM PATRICK JR

ENRIGHT MADELYN ALBERTA

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DONOVAN WILLIAM PATRICK JR

BOGGS JOSIAH C. IV

LASKIN TAMARA ANN

RAMSEY LAWRENCE ROBERT

KIM JASON JONATHAN

TRUAX TIMOTHY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer

6/30/2017: Answer

Answer

9/27/2017: Answer

Legacy Document

1/8/2018: Legacy Document

Notice of Ruling

2/9/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document

3/26/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/16/2018: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

4/30/2018: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

5/8/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/15/2018: Legacy Document

Application

5/15/2018: Application

Legacy Document

5/16/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

5/16/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

5/22/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/22/2018: Legacy Document

Objection

7/3/2018: Objection

Memorandum

10/5/2018: Memorandum

Opposition

11/28/2018: Opposition

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by dha + Calpec (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SWA Architects (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF MARK M. KASSABIAN AND STATUS REPORT IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT); Filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order and Determination of Good-Faith Settlement); Filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation Re: Good-Faith Settlement); Filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CHEM PRO LABORATORY, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCertificate (CERTIFICATE OF MERIT); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by dha + Calpec (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XCEL MECHANICAL SYSTEMS INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NALCO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC NATIONAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where RF Macdonald Co is a litigant