This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2019 at 10:27:20 (UTC).

HENRY GONZALEZ VS CARMEN BOGGIANO

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 HENRY GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARMEN BOGGIANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8549

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GONZALEZ HENRY

Respondents and Defendants

BOGGIANO CARMEN

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MOGHTADER MICHAEL H. ESQ.

MOGHTADER MICHAEL HOMAYOUN ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GHENCIU VLAD

FILIAN ARI JON

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

12/17/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL H. MOGHTADER, ESQ IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTION

12/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL H. MOGHTADER, ESQ IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTION

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

11/19/2019: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/21/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Ruling

10/16/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR SANCTIONS

9/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR SANCTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND FOR SANCTIONS

9/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, HENRY GONZALEZ TO ATTE...)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, HENRY GONZALEZ TO ATTE...)

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER DISCOVERY REQUESTS

8/30/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF, HENRY GONZALEZ TO ATTEND AND TESTIFY AT HIS DEPOSITION

8/30/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF, HENRY GONZALEZ TO ATTEND AND TESTIFY AT HIS DEPOSITION

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

4/12/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/24/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/24/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY

5/24/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CoverSheet -

1/2/2018: CoverSheet -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

1/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael H. Moghtader, Esq in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Terminating Sanction); Filed by Henry Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by Carmen Boggiano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Michael Homayoun Moghtader, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Carmen Boggiano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Carmen Boggiano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Carmen Boggiano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Carmen Boggiano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Henry Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Henry Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Henry Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8549    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

Henry Gonzalez,

Plaintiff,

v.

carmen boggiano,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****8549

Hearing Date: December 17, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion for terminating sanctions

Defendant Carmen Boggiano (“Defendant”) moves to dismiss the complaint of Plaintiff Henry Gonzalez (“Plaintiff”) as a terminating sanction. The Court has discretion to impose terminating sanction when a party willfully disobeys a discovery order. (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2023.010, subd. (g), 2030.290, subd. (c).) The Court may impose a terminating sanction by striking a party’s pleading. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2023.030, subd. (d)(1).)

In its order of October 2, 2019, the Court ordered Plaintiff to serve verified responses to Special Interrogatories, Form Interrogatories, and Requests for Production within thirty (30) days of notice. The Court also ordered Plaintiff to submit to a deposition by this same deadline. Defendant served the order by mail on October 15, 2019, meaning that Plaintiff had until November 19, 2019 to comply with the Court’s order. Plaintiff has not done so. Plaintiff’s counsel proffers a declaration stating that he has not been able to contact his client. This provides no good cause for Plaintiff’s failure to comply with the Court’s orders. The Court has considered the option of imposing lesser sanctions but finds that no sanction will facilitate compliance with this Court’s order. Therefore, the Court grants Defendant’s motion.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion for terminating sanctions is granted. Plaintiff’s complaint against Defendant is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 17, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FILIAN ARI J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHENCIU VLAD RAUL