This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 06:09:42 (UTC).

HENRY ELKOUBY ET AL VS MEK KENNEDY LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 HENRY ELKOUBY filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against MEK KENNEDY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9638

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ELKOUBY HENRY

ELKOUBY ALAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 200

MEK KENNEDY LLC

KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE CENTER

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GEBLER GARY L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MOSELY KATHRYN S.M. ESQ.

ENG KEVIN L.

 

Court Documents

NOTCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/2/2018: NOTCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/19/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

1/24/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT MEK KENNEDY'S MOTION TN LIMINE NO. 24

1/8/2018: DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT MEK KENNEDY'S MOTION TN LIMINE NO. 24

DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT MEK KENNEDY, LLC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE HEARSAY STATEMENTS FROM PLAINTIFFS OR PLAINTIFFS' WITNESSES

1/8/2018: DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT MEK KENNEDY, LLC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE HEARSAY STATEMENTS FROM PLAINTIFFS OR PLAINTIFFS' WITNESSES

DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING INTRODUCTION OF THE BILLED AMOUNT OF MEDICAL EXPENSES; ETC

1/8/2018: DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING INTRODUCTION OF THE BILLED AMOUNT OF MEDICAL EXPENSES; ETC

DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT MEK KENNEDY, LLC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13; ETC.

1/8/2018: DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT MEK KENNEDY, LLC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13; ETC.

DECLARATION OF ELLIOT FELMAN, MD IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDMENT BY DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

1/10/2018: DECLARATION OF ELLIOT FELMAN, MD IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDMENT BY DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

DEFENDANT'S MEK KENNEDY, LLC DBA KENNEDY CARE CENTER (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS MEK KENNEDY, LLC; KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE CENTER) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE STATEMENTS, CRITICISM

1/2/2018: DEFENDANT'S MEK KENNEDY, LLC DBA KENNEDY CARE CENTER (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS MEK KENNEDY, LLC; KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE CENTER) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMNE NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE STATEMENTS, CRITICISM

REQUEST FOR LEGAL FINDINGS UNDER EVID. CODE 669(A)(3), ETC.

1/4/2018: REQUEST FOR LEGAL FINDINGS UNDER EVID. CODE 669(A)(3), ETC.

EXHIBIT A 5- OF 11

11/14/2017: EXHIBIT A 5- OF 11

DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/13/2017: DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/13/2017: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT'S (MEK KENNEDY, LLC DBA KENNEDY CARE CENTER (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS MEK KENNEDY, LLC; KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE CENTER)) REPLY TO PLAINITFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED C

11/17/2017: DEFENDANT'S (MEK KENNEDY, LLC DBA KENNEDY CARE CENTER (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS MEK KENNEDY, LLC; KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE CENTER)) REPLY TO PLAINITFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED C

DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SPECIALLY-SETTING THE HEARING ON CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30-DAYS OF TRIAL OR, ALTERNATIV

11/1/2017: DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SPECIALLY-SETTING THE HEARING ON CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30-DAYS OF TRIAL OR, ALTERNATIV

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/22/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY; POSTING OF JURY FEES

6/19/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY; POSTING OF JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/15/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AS TO: ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Notice (OF ORDER OT SHOW CAUSE RE: DISM ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • at 08:31 am in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment ((DEFT-CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CNT)) - Hearing prev advanced & vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Reply/Response (TO PLNT'S OPPO ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Opposition Document (TO DEFT'S MTN IN LIM # 14 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Reply/Response (AND OPPOSITION TO THE SEPARATE STATEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Opposition Document (TO THE MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Declaration (OF GLENNA M. FRANCIS, ESQ. IN OPPOSIITON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • Declaration (BY TRIAL ATTY ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR HENRY ELKOUBY ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR HENRY ELKOUBY GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (AS TO: Mek Kennedy, LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Case is reassigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (AGAINST JUDGE RUTH ANN KWAN ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

OR.CidAL

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

KATHLEEN M. WALKER, SB# 156128

KEVIN L. ENG, SB# 217248 : FILED SCOTC. B AYLES SB# 291198 - Superior Court of California 633 West 5™ Street, Suite 4000 | County of Los Angeles Los Angeles, CA 90071 _

Telephone: (213) 250-1800 DEC 15 2017

Facsimile: (213) 250-7900 Sherri . Cite, ey OfcerCle Attorneys for Defendants, MEK KENNEDY, LLC dba By A4 .. ZluXel KENNEDY CARE CENTER (erroneously sued as MEK Moses Soto. KENNEDY, LLC; KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE CENTER)

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

HENRY ELKOUBY; ALAN ELKOUBY, CASE NO. BC659638 Plaintiffs, Hon. Susan Bryant-Deason, Dept. 52

VS. DEFENDANT MEK KENNEDY, LLC dba KENNEDY CARE CENTER (erroneously MEK KENNEDY, LLC; KENNEDY POST sued as MEK KENNEDY, LLC; ACUTE CARE CENTER; CEDARS-SINAI KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE | MEDICAL CENTER; and DOES 1 through CENTER)’s ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS’ [ 200, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR

DAMAGES FOR DAMAGES

Defendants.

Action Filed: April 28, 2017 FSC: January 29, 2018 Trial Date: February 7, 2018

TO ALL PARTIES AND TO THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD HEREIN:

COMES NOW defendant MEK KENNEDY, LLC dba KENNEDY CARE CENTER (erroneously sued as MEK KENNEDY, LLC; KENNEDY POST ACUTE CARE CENTER) answers fof itself and no other defendant, admits, denies and alleges as

follows: