This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 11:02:34 (UTC).

HELOU & SONS CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS GLASPRO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 HELOU SONS CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLASPRO, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6709

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELOU & SONS CORP

Defendant

GLASPRO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUBION JUSTIN A.

Defendant Attorney

WARD SCOTT PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/28/2022

11/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/28/2022

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5))

11/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5))

Answer

11/21/2022: Answer

Notice of Ruling

11/21/2022: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

11/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT GP MERGER SUB, INC. DBA GLASPROS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

11/14/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT GP MERGER SUB, INC. DBA GLASPROS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GP MERGER SUB, INC. DBA GLASPROS MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

11/7/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GP MERGER SUB, INC. DBA GLASPROS MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/20/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Brief - BRIEF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/9/2022: Brief - BRIEF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JUSTIN BUBION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JUSTIN BUBION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/9/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

9/9/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Case Management Statement

9/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF IAN R. FELDMAN

9/14/2022: Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF IAN R. FELDMAN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH GREEN

9/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSEPH GREEN

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/28/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Glaspro, Inc., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Answer scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Vacate DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF IAN R. FELDMAN: Filed By: Glaspro, Inc., (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Glaspro, Inc., (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Glaspro, Inc., a California corporation to Glaspro, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Helou & Sons Corp, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Glaspro, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Helou & Sons Corp, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Glaspro, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Helou & Sons Corp, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Glaspro, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6709 Hearing Date: November 21, 2022 Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

HELOU & SONS CORP,

Plaintiff,

vs.

GLASPRO, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: *******6709

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

Date: November 21, 2022

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Glaspro, Inc. (“Moving Defendant”)

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff

The Court has considered the moving, opposition and reply papers.

BACKGROUND

On May 19, 2022, Plaintiff filed a complaint (the “Complaint”) alleging: (1) breach of written contract; (2) breach of written warranty; (3) breach of warranty of merchantability; (4) negligence; (5) negligent misrepresentation; (6) equitable indemnity; (7) contribution; and (8) strict products liability.

On July 26, 2022, default was entered against Moving Defendant. On September 14, 2022, Moving Defendant filed a motion to vacate the default entered against it (the “Motion”) pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure (“CCP”) section 473, subdivision (b).

DISCUSSION

The court is empowered to relieve a party or their legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against them through their mistake, inadvertence, surprise or excusable neglect. (CCP 473, subd. (b).) The court shall, whenever an application for relief is made no more than six months after entry of judgment, is in proper form, and is accompanied by an attorney's sworn affidavit attesting to his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect, vacate any: (1) resulting default entered by the clerk against his or her client, and which will result in entry of a default judgment; or (2) resulting default judgment or dismissal entered against his or her client, unless the court finds that the default or dismissal was not in fact caused by the attorney's mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect. (Id.) The law favors a trial on the merits and courts therefore liberally construe section 473. (Bonzer v. City of Huntington Park (1993) 20 Cal.App.4th 1474, 1477.) Doubts in applying section 473 are resolved in favor of the party seeking relief from default. (Id. at 1478.)

Moving Defendant’s president, Joseph Green (“Green”) learned that Moving Defendant was a party to this lawsuit on May 23, 2022. (Declaration of Joseph Green (“Green Decl.”) 2, Exhibit A.) Within the hour, Green forwarded the summons and Complaint to Moving Defendant’s insurance carrier. (Green Decl. 3.) For reasons unknown to Green, there was a delay either on the part of Moving Defendant’s insurance broker or its insurance carrier in having the insurance carrier assign counsel. (See Green Decl. 4.)

On July 27, 2022, Moving Defendant was assigned counsel by its insurance carrier. (Declaration of Ian R. Feldman (“Feldman Decl.”) 4.) On July 28, 2022, Moving Defendant’s counsel contacted Plaintiff’s counsel and requested that Plaintiff stipulate to set aside the default. (Feldman Decl. 5, Exhibit B.) Through August 16, 2022, counsel for Moving Defendant and Plaintiff conferred about stipulating to set aside the default, but Plaintiff ultimately did not agree to the stipulation. (Feldman Decl. 11.)

Moving Defendant became represented shortly after its default was taken and immediately took steps to participate in this litigation. The Court finds that Moving Defendant has sufficiently shown that its failure to timely respond to the Complaint by virtue of not checking in with its insurance broker/carrier was due to mistake, inadvertence or excusable neglect under Fasuyi v. Permatex, Inc. (2008) 167 Cal.App.4th 681. (See Fasuyi v. Permatex, Inc. (2008) 167 Cal.App.4th 681, 694.)

The Court therefore GRANTS the Motion and orders that the default entered against Moving Defendant be VACATED. Moving Defendant is ordered to file its answer within five court days.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

In consideration of the current COVID-19 pandemic situation, the Court strongly encourages that appearances on all proceedings, including this one, be made by LACourtConnect if the parties do not submit on the tentative. If you instead intend to make an appearance in person at Court on this matter, you must send an email by 2 p.m. on the last Court day before the scheduled date of the hearing to SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org stating your intention to appear in person. The Court will then inform you by close of business that day of the time your hearing will be held. The time set for the hearing may be at any time during that scheduled hearing day, or it may be necessary to schedule the hearing for another date if the Court is unable to accommodate all personal appearances set on that date. This rule is necessary to ensure that adequate precautions can be taken for proper social distancing.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 21st day of November 2022

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court