This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 20:23:13 (UTC).

HELENA ABRAMOVA VS ROY C. ORASCHIN

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 HELENA ABRAMOVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROY C ORASCHIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2075

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABRAMOVA HELENA

Defendant

ORASCHIN ROY C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OGANESYAN OGANES

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/11/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/11/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/9/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Roy C. Oraschin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Roy C. Oraschin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Roy C. Oraschin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Helena Abramova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Helena Abramova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Helena Abramova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Helena Abramova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADEM STEPHANIE N.