Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 05:45:40 (UTC).

HELEN IGONGESIT EDEM, ET AL. VS GALINA PETROVNA LABUNSKY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 HELEN IGONGESIT EDEM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GALINA PETROVNA LABUNSKY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4737

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

IDUNG VICTORIA

EDEM HELEN IGONGESIT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LABUNSKY LEO

LABUNSKY GALINA PETROVNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETIKYAN MKRTICH MIKE

Defendant Attorney

MIYAMOTO RONALD K

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

10/23/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

10/23/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/26/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/23/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Galina Petrovna Labunsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Galina Petrovna Labunsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Galina Petrovna Labunsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Galina Petrovna Labunsky (Defendant); Leo Labunsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Helen Igongesit Edem (Plaintiff); Victoria Idung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Helen Igongesit Edem (Plaintiff); Victoria Idung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Helen Igongesit Edem (Plaintiff); Victoria Idung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Helen Igongesit Edem (Plaintiff); Victoria Idung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Helen Igongesit Edem (Plaintiff); Victoria Idung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIYAMOTO RONALD K