Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 05:17:01 (UTC).

HELAK, MARK VS NEWELL, MARGARET

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 HELAK, MARK filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against NEWELL, MARGARET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PACHECO, RANDALL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1416

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PACHECO, RANDALL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HELAK MARK

Respondent

NEWELL MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.

Respondent Attorney

CHANEY CHRISTOPHER EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Agreement Non-Clets Order

5/3/2021: Stipulation - Agreement Non-Clets Order

Request - Dismissal

5/3/2021: Request - Dismissal

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

1/26/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/26/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Response - Civil Harassment

3/1/2021: Response - Civil Harassment

Proof of Service - Mail - Re: Ch-120

3/1/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Re: Ch-120

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

3/3/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - AMENDED

3/3/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - AMENDED

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/3/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

12/15/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - AMENDED

11/3/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - AMENDED

Proof of Service

11/3/2020: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/3/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

11/3/2020: Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

Petition - Civil Harassment

10/13/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

10/13/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

10/13/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketStipulation (Agreement Non-Clets Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (AMENDED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Re: Ch-120 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (AMENDED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (w/ Addendum )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.