This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 03:07:36 (UTC).

HEIDI LIDDELL, ET AL. VS THE ADDRESS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 HEIDI LIDDELL, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE ADDRESS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AUDRA MORI, VIRGINIA KEENY, VALERIE SALKIN and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4931

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AUDRA MORI

VIRGINIA KEENY

VALERIE SALKIN

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIDDELL HEIDI

SHATTUCK COURTNEY

Defendants

ALBA FRANCINE LYNCH

APB PROPERTIES LLC

BAER CHRISTINA LAWS

GORDON PAIGE LAWRENCE

MAGNUM PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC

PALMQUIST TROY DANIEL

STRATEGIC ACQUISITIONS INC.

STRATEGIC MAGNUM HOLDINGS INC.

STRATEGIC REALTY INC.

THE ADDRESS INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

PALMQUIST TROY DANIEL

Cross Defendant and Defendant

THE ADDRESS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GILLEON DANIEL MARK

CORRALES MANUEL JR

Defendant Attorneys

BURNS ELKANAH JOHNSOM

KNEE HOWARD M

KNEE HOWARD MICHAEL

WENTWORTH NICOLE NOELANI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/29/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/29/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/29/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/25/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/2/2023: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/28/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/28/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/1/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference; Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/31/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketOrder [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Magnum Property Investments, LLC (Defendant); Christina Laws Baer (Defendant); Francine Lynch Alba (Defendant); Troy Daniel Palmquist (Defendant); As to: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketStipulation - No Order Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Magnum Property Investments, LLC (Defendant); Christina Laws Baer (Defendant); Francine Lynch Alba (Defendant); Troy Daniel Palmquist (Defendant); As to: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff); As to: The Address, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Acquisitions, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Realty, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff); As to: The Address, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Acquisitions, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Realty, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff); As to: The Address, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Acquisitions, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Realty, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff); As to: The Address, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Acquisitions, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Realty, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/01/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff); As to: The Address, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Acquisitions, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Realty, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Heidi Liddell (Plaintiff); Courtney Shattuck (Plaintiff); As to: The Address, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Acquisitions, Inc. (Defendant); Strategic Realty, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less