This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 13:32:19 (UTC).

HEIDI KIM, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS KIHO KIM, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 HEIDI KIM, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KIHO KIM, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8325

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL ANGELA

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL HEIDI

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL KIHO

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL KYUNG JOO

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL HEIDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG CHIAYU VALENIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/18/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

10/18/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

12/10/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/10/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2024
  • Hearing10/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by KIHO KIM, an Individual (Defendant); KYUNG JOO KIM, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by KIHO KIM, an Individual (Defendant); KYUNG JOO KIM, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KIHO KIM, an Individual (Defendant); KYUNG JOO KIM, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by HEIDI KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff); ANGELA KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HEIDI KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff); ANGELA KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HEIDI KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff); ANGELA KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((Re: 21STCV38235 and 21STCV26208) - must be ruled by Dept. 32); Filed by HEIDI KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff); ANGELA KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HEIDI KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff); ANGELA KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HEIDI KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff); ANGELA KIM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG CHIAYU V.