This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 20:02:32 (UTC).

HEIDARI LAW GROUP, P.C., A LEGAL CORPORATION VS MHM LAW GROUP, A LEGAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 HEIDARI LAW GROUP, P C , A LEGAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MHM LAW GROUP, A LEGAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5783

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEIDARI LAW GROUP P.C. A LEGAL CORPORATION

Defendants

AAA INSURANCE COMPANY A PROFESSIONAL COMPANY

MHM LAW GROUP A LEGAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIDARI SAM RYAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HEIDARI LAW GROUP, P.C., a legal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HEIDARI LAW GROUP, P.C., a legal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HEIDARI LAW GROUP, P.C., a legal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MHM LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HEIDARI LAW GROUP A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIDARI SAM