This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 04:52:43 (UTC).

HEE OK HONG VS AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 HEE OK HONG filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8258

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

HONG HEE OK

Defendants and Respondents

AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LEE HENRY M. ESQ.

LEE HENRY MIN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEE HONG DEGERMAN KANG & WAIMEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/17/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

1/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/23/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

1/17/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/23/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/24/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/9/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR REFUND

11/21/2017: REQUEST FOR REFUND

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/4/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT AROMA SPA & SPORTS, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/15/2017: DEFENDANT AROMA SPA & SPORTS, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/16/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

10/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by HEE OK HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 28; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by HEE OK HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • Notice; Filed by HEE OK HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Reimbursement of Fees; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR REFUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Answer; Filed by AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DEFENDANT AROMA SPA & SPORTS, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by HEE OK HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by HEE OK HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC is a litigant