This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 18:34:29 (UTC).

HECTOR RENE APODACA, , ET AL. VS ASBESTOS COMPANIES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 HECTOR RENE APODACA, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS COMPANIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8173

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APODACA HECTOR RENE

Defendants

3M COMPANY

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC.

ASBESTOS COMPANIES

ATWOOD & MORRILL CO. INC DBA WEIR VALVES AND CONTROLS USA INC.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION FKA COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION NAMED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO COOPER-BESSEMER CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

CUMMINS INC.

DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS INC.

DOVER CORPORATION ALIAS BLACKMER PUMP

E.F. BRADY COMPANY INC.

FMC CORPORATION FKA NORTHERN PUMP CO.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

GREENE TWEED & CO.

GRINNELL LLC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLD ROGER EDWARD

Defendant Attorneys

CHANG STEPHANIE C.

DAVIS GEOFFREY M.

DUFFY JOSEPH

FOLEY PATRICK J.

GREENSLADE JOSEPH

HUGO EDWARD

KARREN ESQ BRENT M

OLSON DEAN ALBERT

PEATMAN STEPHANIE GHANEM

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

SCHATZ RUSS

TINKOFF SHELLEY K.

AMEELE MELANIE L

BRAY KENDRA

CALFO PAUL ANGELO

CARINO ALLELI

KING BRYAN LAWRENCE

MAKI CRAIG R.

MCKLEROY GARDINER

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/30/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/5/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Demand for Jury Trial

7/7/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT MECHANICAL DRIVES & BELTING, FKA L.A. RUBBER COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7/7/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT MECHANICAL DRIVES & BELTING, FKA L.A. RUBBER COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Notice of Appearance

7/7/2022: Notice of Appearance

Answer - DEFENDANT CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/7/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT GREENE TWEED & CO.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7/7/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT GREENE TWEED & CO.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Answer - DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. STRICT LIABILITY; 3. PRODUCTS LIABILITY (NEGLIGENCE AND STRICT LIABILITY) FOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY; 4. PR

7/8/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. STRICT LIABILITY; 3. PRODUCTS LIABILITY (NEGLIGENCE AND STRICT LIABILITY) FOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY; 4. PR

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - (ASBESTOS) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - (ASBESTOS) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7/8/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

7/8/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

7/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

7/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES-ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES-ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer

7/8/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

7/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Cameron International Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company?s Answer To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Damages; Demand For Jury Trial); Filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Remote Appearance); Filed by Aurora Pump Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Aurora Pump Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Defendant The Aurora Pump Company?s Answer To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Damages); Filed by Aurora Pump Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Hector Rene Apodaca, (Plaintiff); Dolores W. ST. Amour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Crane Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Defendant Mechanical Drives & Belting, Fka L.A. Rubber Company?s Answer To Complaint For Damages); Filed by Mechanical Drives & Belting (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDefendant Cameron International Corporation?s Answer To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Damages; Demand For Jury Trial; Filed by Cameron International Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Hector Rene Apodaca, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Hector Rene Apodaca, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hector Rene Apodaca, (Plaintiff); Dolores W. ST. Amour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hector Rene Apodaca, (Plaintiff); Dolores W. ST. Amour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hector Rene Apodaca, (Plaintiff); Dolores W. ST. Amour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOVER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where E.F. BRADY COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENE TWEED & CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ATWOOD & MORRILL is a litigant