This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 15:20:34 (UTC).

HECTOR MAGANA VS DOE DEFENDANT 1, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 HECTOR MAGANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE DEFENDANT 1. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1602

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGANA HECTOR

Defendants

DOE DEFENDANT 1

DOE DEFENDANT 2

DOE DEFENDANT 3

DOE DEFENDANT 4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH BRIAN J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/22/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HECTOR MAGANA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HECTOR MAGANA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HECTOR MAGANA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH