This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 00:12:04 (UTC).

HECTOR JIMENEZ VS TACTICAL TASK FORCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 HECTOR JIMENEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TACTICAL TASK FORCE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1890

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMENEZ HECTOR

Defendants

REYES OMAR GARCIA

SANDOVAL JULIO

TACTICAL TASK FORCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CABRERA CRISTAL L.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/8/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/7/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Service by Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Service by Publication scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 12/02/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/02/2022 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Case Management Statement By Plaintiff: Name Extension: By Plaintiff; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Hector Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAddress for Cristal L. Cabrera (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Julio Sandoval (Defendant), Omar Garcia Reyes (Defendant), Tactical Task Force, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) to Omar Garcia Reyes (Defendant), Tactical Task Force, Inc. (Defendant), Julio Sandoval (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hector Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Tactical Task Force, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Julio Sandoval (Defendant); Omar Garcia Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Hector Jimenez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hector Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Tactical Task Force, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Julio Sandoval (Defendant); Omar Garcia Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hector Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Tactical Task Force, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Julio Sandoval (Defendant); Omar Garcia Reyes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CABRERA CRISTAL L. ESQ.