This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2023 at 14:37:34 (UTC).

HECTOR HERMOSILLO VS AIR-CITY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 HECTOR HERMOSILLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AIR-CITY, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7714

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERMOSILLO HECTOR

Defendants

AIR-CITY INC.

AMERICAN FREIGHT INT'L LAX CORP.

RUAN LANGFAN

SEKO WORLDWIDE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN

Defendant Attorneys

GHOLIAN JANELLA TINEKE

GUOFENG LI

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/11/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE

5/1/2023: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF GUOFENG LI FOR AMERICAN FREIGHT INT'L LAX CORP., AND LANGFAN RUAN

5/1/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF GUOFENG LI FOR AMERICAN FREIGHT INT'L LAX CORP., AND LANGFAN RUAN

Substitution of Attorney

2/3/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/3/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF COURTS AUGUST 19, 2022 ORDERS

9/12/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURTS AUGUST 19, 2022 ORDERS

Case Management Order

8/19/2022: Case Management Order

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

8/19/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE- CASE ANYWHERE

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/19/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FIL...)

8/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FIL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/25/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Initial Status Conference Order

3/25/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AIR-CITY, INC.)

4/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AIR-CITY, INC.)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (LANGFAN RUAN)

4/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (LANGFAN RUAN)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AMERICAN FREIGHT INT'L LAX CORP.)

4/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AMERICAN FREIGHT INT'L LAX CORP.)

Initial Status Conference Report - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

5/27/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Hector Hermosillo (Plaintiff); As to: Air-City, Inc. (Defendant); American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant); Langfan Ruan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Guofeng Li for American Freight Int'l LAX Corp., and Langfan Ruan; Filed by: American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant); Langfan Ruan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Class Certification Deadline: Status Date changed from 05/01/2023 to 05/01/2023 ; Filed By: Hector Hermosillo (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Exact Name changed from Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Class Certification Deadline to Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Class Certification Deadline ; Result Date: 05/01/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Langfan Ruan (Defendant), Air-City, Inc. (Defendant), American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant) to Langfan Ruan (Defendant), American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant), Air-City, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketJoint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Class Certification Deadline; Signed and Filed by: Hector Hermosillo (Plaintiff); As to: Air-City, Inc. (Defendant); American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant); Langfan Ruan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/02/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Langfan Ruan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Courts August 19, 2022 Orders; Filed by: Hector Hermosillo (Plaintiff); As to: Air-City, Inc. (Defendant); American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant); Langfan Ruan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hector Hermosillo (Plaintiff); As to: Air-City, Inc. (Defendant); American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant); Langfan Ruan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 9 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hector Hermosillo (Plaintiff); As to: Air-City, Inc. (Defendant); American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant); Langfan Ruan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hector Hermosillo (Plaintiff); As to: Air-City, Inc. (Defendant); American Freight Int'l Lax Corp. (Defendant); Langfan Ruan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less