This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 01:57:33 (UTC).

HECTOR ESCOBAR VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 HECTOR ESCOBAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3492

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCOBAR HECTOR

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EDISON INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GOLSHAN SIAVOSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDERSON MICHAEL DALE

SERPIK ANDREI V.

Defendant Attorneys

DANIELS JACOB W

TUTT ANTOINETTE RAMONA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)

12/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

5/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

5/28/2021: Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE: SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

2/16/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE: SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

2/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 02/22/2021

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 02/22/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Case Management Statement

3/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

3/25/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/3/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Status Conference (Re ADR) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re ADR)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hector Escobar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder (Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Southern California Edison, a California Corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California Corporation (Defendant); Siavosh Golshan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason); Filed by Southern California Edison, a California Corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California Corporation (Defendant); Siavosh Golshan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hector Escobar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hector Escobar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hector Escobar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERPIK ANDREI V.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON MICHAEL DALE