This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2020 at 21:18:11 (UTC).

HECTOR DAVID FLORES-SANDOVAL VS HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 HECTOR DAVID FLORES-SANDOVAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7321

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES-SANDOVAL HECTOR DAVID

Defendants

STAY SAFE STAFFING INC.

PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP LLC

BROADLEAF VENISON USA INC.

HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYES JORGE H.

Defendant Attorneys

YANNI REBEKAH E.

KEENEY CHRISTIAN

MOON ALIS M.

MINGUET MICHAEL R.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

12/13/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/13/2019

12/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/13/2019

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER

10/16/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/30/2019: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Order

9/23/2019: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEFENDANT BROADLEAF VENISON (USA) INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/27/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEFENDANT BROADLEAF VENISON (USA) INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Answer

9/30/2019: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER; NOTICE OF TRIAL

9/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER; NOTICE OF TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/16/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/5/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

8/9/2019: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Answer - ANSWER HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC. AND STAY SASFE STAFFING, INC'S ANSWER TO HECTOR DAVID FLORES SANDOVAL'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/9/2019: Answer - ANSWER HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC. AND STAY SASFE STAFFING, INC'S ANSWER TO HECTOR DAVID FLORES SANDOVAL'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order); Filed by Broadleaf Venison (USA) Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer (OF DEFENDANT PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP, LLC TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Personnel Staffing Group, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Horizon Personnel Services, Inc. (Defendant); Stay Safe Staffing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEFENDANT BROADLEAF VENISON (USA) INC.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES); Filed by Broadleaf Venison (USA) Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hector David Flores-Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less