This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 19:32:26 (UTC).

HECTOR D. BERMUDEZ VS FCA US LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 HECTOR D BERMUDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3280

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERMUDEZ HECTOR D.

Defendants

FCA US LLC

GLENDALE DODGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELARDE RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

HANSON ERIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

12/29/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hector D. Bermudez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hector D. Bermudez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hector D. Bermudez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hector D. Bermudez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hector D. Bermudez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE DODGE LLC DBA GLENDALE DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSON ERIN E.