This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 14:55:32 (UTC).

HECTOR CRUZ SEGURA, ET AL. VS VICTOR NAVARETTE SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 HECTOR CRUZ SEGURA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VICTOR NAVARETTE SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8848

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

SANCHEZ VICTOR NAVARETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR HECTOR

5/17/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR HECTOR

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

4/21/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VICTOR

4/21/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VICTOR

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR HECTOR

4/28/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR HECTOR

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

4/28/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VICTOR

4/29/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VICTOR

Complaint

3/11/2022: Complaint

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/11/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/11/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/11/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/14/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VICTOR

3/14/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VICTOR

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/14/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2025
  • Hearing03/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Hector); Filed by Hector Cruz Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Victor); Filed by Victor Garcia Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Hector); Filed by Hector Cruz Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Victor); Filed by Victor Garcia Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hector Cruz Segura (Plaintiff); Victor Garcia Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hector Cruz Segura (Plaintiff); Victor Garcia Segura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.