Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2021 at 16:41:28 (UTC).

HEATHER SZAFRANSKI VS MICHAEL HOLLINGHURST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 HEATHER SZAFRANSKI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MICHAEL HOLLINGHURST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0160

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SZAFRANSKI HEATHER

Defendants

HOLLINGHURST MICHAEL

NETWORK FINANCIAL SERVICE AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE JASON M.

SLATER BLAKE S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/30/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Heather Szafranski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Heather Szafranski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Heather Szafranski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLATER BLAKE S.