This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2019 at 20:10:49 (UTC).

HEATHER SCHOLL ET AL VS FRIMET GROSS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 HEATHER SCHOLL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRIMET GROSS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9394

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ZUCAL JAMES

SCHOLL HEATHER

Defendants and Respondents

GROSS MORRIS

R & E MANAGEMENT GROUP

GROSS FRIMET

FRIMET GROSS AS TRUSTEE FOR GROSS FAMILY

MORRIS GROSS AS TRUSTEE FOR GROSS FAMILY

DOES 1 - 30

GROSS FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RAND-LEWIS SUZANNE E. ESQ.

RAND-LEWIS SUZANNE ELIZABETH ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HEATHCOTE TAMARA

JANVELIAN ALEXANDER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/22/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/22/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

11/5/2019: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/8/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

11/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Order - ORDER COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

11/18/2019: Order - ORDER COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 11/18/2019

11/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 11/18/2019

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/1/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CoverSheet -

6/6/2018: CoverSheet -

Summons -

6/6/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

6/6/2018: Complaint -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Frimet Gross (Defendant); Frimet Gross as Trustee for Gross Family (Defendant); Morris Gross (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Filed by Defendant, R&E Management Group) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Filed by Defendant, R&E Management Group) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...) of 11/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketOrder (Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Hearing Date Re: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings); Filed by R & E Management Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by R & E Management Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by R & E Management Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by R & E Management Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Heather Scholl (Plaintiff); James Zucal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Heather Scholl (Plaintiff); James Zucal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709394    Hearing Date: December 04, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the West District, Santa Monica, JUDGE ELAIN MANDEL presiding in Department P for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.