Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 09:19:09 (UTC).

HEATHER MCCOY VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 HEATHER MCCOY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1749

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCOY HEATHER

Defendants

MARK CHRISTOPHER CHEVROLET INC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA MARK CHRISTOPHER CHEVROLET

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MARK CHRISTOPHER CHEVROLET INC. DBA MARK CHRISTOPHER CHEVROLET

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIRTZ RICHARD M.

Defendant Attorneys

HODGES RONALD

SHUGART JONATHAN M.

MCBRIDE MARY ARENS

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/3/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/25/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021, A COPY OF L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021, A COPY OF L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/11/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

4/28/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 05/03/2021

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • Hearing07/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:52 PM in Department 16; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/25/2021, A copy of L.A.S.C. Minute Order issued this date is attached to the Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mark Christopher Chevrolet, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; Filed by Mark Christopher Chevrolet, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Heather McCoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARK CHRISTOPHER CHEVROLET INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA MARK CHRISTOPHER AUTO CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCBRIDE MARY ARENS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HODGES RONALD S. ESQ.