This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2020 at 09:15:35 (UTC).

HEATHER LEA GERDES VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 HEATHER LEA GERDES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, WILLIAM F. FAHEY and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4886

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GERDES HEATHER LEA

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

HOLLYWOOD ATHLETIC CLUB LLC

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

THE SUNSET LANDMARK INVESTMENT LLC

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER

DOES 1 TO 100

HOLLYWOOD ATHLETIC CLUB INC

HOLLYWOOD ATHLETIC CLUB

SWISHER PRODUCTIONS LLC

PARK & ROL INC.

CHUCK PARKING SERVICE DOE 77

CHUCK'S PARKING SERVICE DOE 53

PARK & ROL INC. DOE 76

PARK & ROL INC. DOE 52

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

ROES 1 THROUGH 20

SWISHER PRODUCTIONS LLC

CHUCK PARKING SERVICE DOE 77

ROES 1 TO 50

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARZBAN MICHAEL M. ESQ.

MARZBAN MICHAEL M. ESQ

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITAKER RONALD S. DEPUTY CITY ATTY.

GARY H. KLEIN

WOOG PHIL

WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY

KLEIN GARY HOWARD ESQ.

WOOG PHILIP MICHAEL ESQ.

WHITAKER RONALD STEPHEN DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

BOUCHE' JACQUELINE ESQ.

KLEIN GARY H.

WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY ESQ.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

BOUCHE' JACQUELINE ESQ.

BOUCHE' JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT THE SUNSET LANDMARK INVESTMENT, LLC'S MO...)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT THE SUNSET LANDMARK INVESTMENT, LLC'S MO...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

3/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/13/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 03/02/2020

3/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 03/02/2020

Substitution of Attorney

12/19/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/13/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - Answer of the Defendant Department of Water and Power

11/1/2018: Answer - Answer of the Defendant Department of Water and Power

Answer - Answer to First Amended Cross-Complaint

10/15/2018: Answer - Answer to First Amended Cross-Complaint

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS- COMPLAINANT, THE SUNSET LANDMARK INVESTMENT, LLC

7/11/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS- COMPLAINANT, THE SUNSET LANDMARK INVESTMENT, LLC

SUMMONS -

7/13/2018: SUMMONS -

ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/14/2018: ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS -

6/15/2018: SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

5/4/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ANTI 945 ;ETC

5/4/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ANTI 945 ;ETC

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Hearing10/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Hearing08/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Hearing08/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT); Filed by The Sunset Landmark Investment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Re Receipt of (Proposed) Summary Judgment by Defendant The Sunset Landmark Investment, LLC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 3:44 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Entry of Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Heather Lea Gerdes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Heather Lea Gerdes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Heather Lea Gerdes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ANTI 945 ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Heather Lea Gerdes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704886    Hearing Date: March 03, 2020    Dept: 29

BC704886 GERDES V. CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES,  JUDGE WILLIAM FAHEY presiding in Department 69 for all purposes except trial.  Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.   Any pending motions or hearings, including trial or status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar Court.  (NOTE: All hearings currently set in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse are taken off calendar subject to being reset and notified by the receiving court Re: New hearing dates.) Judicial Assistant is directed to give notice to Plaintiff, who upon receipt of this notice, is ordered to give notice to all Parties of record.