This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 02:16:58 (UTC).

HEATHER CONSTANCE VELASQUEZ VS FLOYD STEVEN WILSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 HEATHER CONSTANCE VELASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FLOYD STEVEN WILSON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9845

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELASQUEZ HEATHER CONSTANCE

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

WILSON FLOYD STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WISEMAN ALFRED J.

HOFFS JESSE T.

Defendant Attorney

LEE DAVID DAIWAI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/26/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/2/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

7/8/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/24/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTIONDISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

9/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTIONDISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/9/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

3/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Heather Constance Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jesse T. Hoffs (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTIONDISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)); Filed by Heather Constance Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Floyd Steven Wilson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Heather Constance Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Heather Constance Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Heather Constance Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Heather Constance Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less