This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 11:08:07 (UTC).

HEALTHSOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC VS ARROW MED RX INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 HEALTHSOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARROW MED RX INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3250

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTHSOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

Defendants

AKOPNIK ALEXANDER

ARROW MED RX INC

JANA HEALTHCAR PHARMACY

Respondent and Defendant

JANA HEALTHCAR PHARMACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAFARI EAMON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; ETC

2/14/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; ETC

SUMMONS

2/14/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/27/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/13/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/29/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE

5/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/24/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

JUDGMENT

5/24/2018: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION

5/24/2018: DECLARATION

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/24/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF JERRY WOLASKY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 585

5/24/2018: DECLARATION OF JERRY WOLASKY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 585

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OIF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/24/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OIF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

5/24/2018: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketWrit-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JERRY WOLASKY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Healthsource Distributors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Healthsource Distributors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Healthsource Distributors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Healthsource Distributors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Healthsource Distributors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Healthsource Distributors, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

(3 o . | Arrorney or Party without Altorney:

EAMON JAFARI (SBN 294952)

JACOB R. GOULD (SBN 295361)

For Cowrt Use

FILED

Superior Court of Californ a

5233 MELROSE AVE

4. Address where the party was served. LOS ANGELES, CA 90038

3. Iserved the party: b. by substitute service. On Feb 26 2018 at 5:32 pm by leaving the copies with or in the presence of: Robert Valencia (F, His, 30, 5"7, 175, Black Hair, Brown Eyes)

(1) (Business) A person at least 18 years of age apparently in charge at the office or usual place of busmess of the person to be served. I

informedgeneral nature of the papers. (4) | thereafter mailed (by first-class, postage prepaid) copies of the docurrients to the person to be served at the place where the copies were left

(Code Civ. Proc. 415.20) 1 mailed the documents on 02/27/2018 from Los Angeles. (5) I attached a declaration of diligence stating actions taken first to attempt personal service.

6. The "Notice 1o the Person Served" (on the Summons)was comp?eled as Jollows:

a. as an Individua! Defendant 7. Person Who Served Papers: Recoverable Cost Per CCP 1033.5(ak4)B) d. The Fee for Service was: $50.00

a. Tamar Ravid b. BytheBookAttorneyService e. lam: (3) registered California process server

3637 Glendon Avenue Suite 203 (i) Owner Los Angeles, CA 90034 (ii) Registration No.: 5967 (iii} County: Los Angeles

. (818)445-7448 (iv) Expiration Date:

i 0 o o

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTHSOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARROW-MED RX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAFARI EAMON ESQ.