This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 14:38:20 (UTC).

HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA, LLC VS CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9910

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC

Defendant

CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A

Defendant Attorney

IMEL LAWRENCE JENNINGS

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/2/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/19/2022, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

9/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/19/2022, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 09/19/2022, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cornerstone OnDemand, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Docketat 10:15 AM in Department 62; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant