This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2019 at 21:38:20 (UTC).

HD SUPPLY CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, LTD VS DARMONT CONSTRUCTION CORP,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 HD SUPPLY CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, LTD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DARMONT CONSTRUCTION CORP,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0158

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HD SUPPLY CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY LTD DBA HD SUPPLY WHITE CAP CPNSTRUCTION SUPPLY A FLORDIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDON ROBYN

DARMONT CONSTRUCTION CORP

GONZALES ISRAEL

HOLLYWOOD INTERNATIONAL REGIONAL CENTER LLC

ORDON ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOWNSEND MICHAEL STOLL

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

6/25/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

Request for Dismissal

5/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/21/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF LOST/UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL DOCUMENT

5/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF LOST/UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL DOCUMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

5/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/5/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/2/2018: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (/ Entry of Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Default by Court); Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Plaintiff in support of lost/unavailable Original document); Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HD Supply Construction Supply, LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less