This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2020 at 11:37:38 (UTC).

HAZEL MCKILLOP, MD; ET AL VS HEALING HANDS...; ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 HAZEL MCKILLOP, MD filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against HEALING HANDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT, STUART M. RICE, DEIRDRE HILL and RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2757

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

STUART M. RICE

DEIRDRE HILL

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCKILLOP MD. HAZEL

INNLEY MEDICAL GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORP.

MCKILLOP HAZEL

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

OGUNDIMU GRACE

OGUNDIMU OLAYINKA

OGUNDIMU CHARLES

OGUNDIMU TUNDE

SONUGA OLUSOLA

HEALING HANDS ONCOLOGY AND MEDICAL CARE..

2220 MANCHESTER BLVD. LLC. ...

OGUNDIMU OLUWAATOSIN

DOES 1 TO 20

WALLACE MD. OLUKEMI

OGUNDIMU BABATUNDE

HEALING HANDS ONCOLOGY AND MEDICAL CARE.

WALLACE OLUKEMI M.D.

OGUNDIMI OLUWAATOSIN

OGUNDIMI OLAYINKA

2220 MANCHESTER BLVD. LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ONWAEZE OGOCHUKWU VICTOR

Defendant Attorneys

MARSHALL G. MINTZ

MINTZ MARSHALL G.

CAMPBELL RENEE LILLIE

MINTZ MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU ...)

2/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARSHALL G. MINTZ IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TUNDE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

8/14/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARSHALL G. MINTZ IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TUNDE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARSHALL G. MINTZ IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

8/14/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARSHALL G. MINTZ IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT OLUKEMI WALLACE, MD. TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS W

6/11/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT OLUKEMI WALLACE, MD. TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS W

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT OLUKEMI WALLACE, MD. TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT OBJEC

6/11/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT OLUKEMI WALLACE, MD. TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT OBJEC

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT OBJECTION,

6/11/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT OBJECTION,

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPEICAL INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT OBJECTION A

6/11/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GRACE OGUNDIMU TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO SPEICAL INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT OBJECTION A

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

4/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

4/10/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/20/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

6/15/2018: Answer

Answer

10/31/2018: Answer

Notice of Related Case -

7/3/2018: Notice of Related Case -

Notice of Motion - OF PLAINTIFF

7/20/2018: Notice of Motion - OF PLAINTIFF

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

8/17/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Reply -

8/21/2018: Reply -

Case Management Statement -

8/23/2018: Case Management Statement -

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel Defendant Olukemi Wallace, M.D., to Provide Reponses to Special Interrogatories without Objections, and Request for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel Defendant Tunde Ogundimu to Provide Responses to Special Interrogatories without Objections, and Request for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel Defendant Tunde Ogundimu to Provide Responses to Request for Production of Documents without objection, and Request for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel Defendant Olukemi Wallace, M.D., to Provide Responses to Request for Production of Documents without objection, and Request for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of the Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel Defendant Grace Ogundimu to Provide Responses to Special Interrogatories without objection, and Request for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Hearing05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion - Other to Compel Defendant Grace Ogundimu to Provide Responses to Request for Production of Documents without objection, and Request for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to Compel Defendant Grace Ogundimu to Provide Responses to Request for Production of Documents without objection, and Request for Sanctions) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketAmended Notice; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Healing Hands Oncology and Medical Care. (Defendant); Olukemi, Wallace, M.D. (Defendant); Grace Ogundimu (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Olukemi, Wallace, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hazel McKillop (Plaintiff); Innley Medical Group, a California Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hazel McKillop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Hazel McKillop (Plaintiff); Innley Medical Group, a California Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: YC072757    Hearing Date: July 23, 2020    Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka Thursday – July 23, 2020

Department B Calendar No. 3

PROCEEDINGS

Hazel McKillop, M.D., et al. v. Healing Hands Oncology and Medical Care, Inc., et al.

YC072757

  1. Hazel McKillop, M.D.’s Motion for an Order to Compel Responses from Defendant Olukemi Wallace, M.D. to Special Interrogatories

  2. Hazel McKillop, M.D.’s Motion for an Order to Compel Responses from Defendant Olukemi Wallace, M.D. to Request for Production of Documents

  3. Hazel McKillop, M.D.’s Motion for an Order to Compel Responses from Defendant Grace Ogundimu to Special Interrogatories

  4. Hazel McKillop, M.D.’s Motion for an Order to Compel Responses from Defendant Grace Ogundimu to Request for Production of Documents

  5. Hazel McKillop, M.D.’s Motion for an Order to Compel Responses from Defendant Tunde Ogundimu to Special Interrogatories

  6. Hazel McKillop, M.D.’s Motion for an Order to Compel Responses from Defendant Tunde Ogundimu to Request for Production of Documents

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiff Hazel McKillop’s Motions for Orders to Compel Responses from Defendants Olukemi Wallace, M.D., Grace Ogundimu, and Tunde Ogundimu to Special Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents are deemed moot.

CCP § 2030.290 states: “If a party to whom interrogatories are directed fails to serve a timely response, the following rules apply…The party propounding the interrogatories may move for an order compelling response to the interrogatories.” (CCP § 2030.290(b).)

CCP § 2031.300 states: “If a party to whom a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed fails to serve a timely response to it, the following rules shall apply: The party making the demand may move for an order compelling response to the demand.” (CCP § 2031.300(b)).

Defendants’ counsel states that responses have been served. (Declarations, Marshall G. Mintz, ¶¶ 5-7). Plaintiff did not file any Replies and, thus, apparently, does not dispute that responses were served. Plaintiff’s request for monetary sanctions is denied. 

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.