This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 11:54:26 (UTC).

HAZEL ESCAJEDA VS 1 STOP AUTO SALES & FINANCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 HAZEL ESCAJEDA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1 STOP AUTO SALES FINANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8644

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ESCAJEDA HAZEL

1 STOP AUTO SALES AND FINANCE INC. A CORPORATION

AGUILAR DAVID

GEEK LENDING INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

1 STOP AUTO SALES & FINANCE

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

TIDALWAVE FINANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARA PAULIANA

Defendant Attorney

SOSA CARLOS E.

Cross Defendant Attorney

DAUGHERTY FRANK

 

Court Documents

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

8/4/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

Complaint

8/4/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/4/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/4/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE NON SERVICE REPORT

8/23/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE NON SERVICE REPORT

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

8/23/2021: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

8/23/2021: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/31/2021: Cross-Complaint

General Denial

8/31/2021: General Denial

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/18/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

10/18/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Aguilar (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by David Aguilar (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Old Republic Surety Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service (Non Service Report); Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Of Venue); Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hazel Escajeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEEK LANDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TIDALWAVE FINANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where 1 STOP AUTO SALES AND FINANCE DBA 1 STOP AUTO SALES AND FINANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant