This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 03:25:31 (UTC).

HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION VS ALTO SYSTEMS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALTO SYSTEMS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0434

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYWARD INDUSTRIES INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Defendant

ALTO SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/25/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/26/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hayward Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTO SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel J