This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 10:36:04 (UTC).

HAYLEEN PORTILLO VS SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANACEK ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 HAYLEEN PORTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANACEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4440

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTILLO HAYLEEN

Defendants

HANACEK MARK

HANCEK SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

BRAL S. SEAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PRZYBYLOWSKI CHRISTIAN X.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

9/1/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS

9/1/2017: SUMMONS

Notice of Ruling

6/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

5/31/2019: Minute Order

Motion to Continue Trial Date

5/8/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Stipulation and Order

2/14/2019: Stipulation and Order

DIFENDANTS SHAWYN MARIE RAMOS HANACEK AND MARK HANACEK'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF HAYLEEN PORTILLOS COMPLAINT

8/24/2018: DIFENDANTS SHAWYN MARIE RAMOS HANACEK AND MARK HANACEK'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF HAYLEEN PORTILLOS COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

8/24/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANCEK (Defendant); MARK HANACEK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (Date and Reset all Related Cutoff Dates Based in the New Trial Date) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial Date and Reset all Relate...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANCEK (Defendant); MARK HANACEK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (PROPOSED ORDER & STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANCEK (Defendant); MARK HANACEK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDIFENDANTS SHAWYN MARIE RAMOS HANACEK AND MARK HANACEK'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF HAYLEEN PORTILLOS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANCEK (Defendant); MARK HANACEK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANCEK (Defendant); MARK HANACEK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HAYLEEN PORTILLO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4440    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

HAYLEEN PORTILLO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SHAILYN MARIE RAMOS HANACEK, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: ****4440

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE OFF CALENDAR

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 14, 2020

Defendants filed this motion to continue trial on 12/19/19 and set it for hearing on 1/14/20.  Defendants seek an order continuing the trial in this action to 5/12/20.  On 12/20/19, Defendants made an ex parte application to continue the trial date, which the Court granted; trial is now scheduled for 5/12/20.  The motion to continue trial is moot, but Defendants have not taken it off calendar.  The Court asks Defense Counsel to promptly take matters off calendar in this and other actions when matters become moot, as this will reduce the need to expend judicial resources reviewing matters that are no longer at issue.  The Court takes the motion to continue the trial date off calendar as moot at this time. 

Defendants are ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRZYBYLOWSKI CHRISTIAN XAVIER