Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2021 at 14:24:52 (UTC).

HAYK KOCHARYAN VS NATALIE ASSAYAG

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 HAYK KOCHARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATALIE ASSAYAG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3446

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOCHARYAN HAYK

Defendant

ASSAYAG NATALIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHIRINYAN EDITA

MARTINIAN TIGRAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/11/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/13/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hayk Kocharyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hayk Kocharyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hayk Kocharyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hayk Kocharyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hayk Kocharyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hayk Kocharyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIRINYAN EDITA