This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2020 at 05:21:25 (UTC).

HAYAN CHARLTON ET AL VS DAVID SAFFRON ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 HAYAN CHARLTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID SAFFRON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8601

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KIM CHIN SE

CHARLTON HAYAN

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

KAGEL DAVID L.

KAGEL LAW P.C.

SAFFRON DAVID

KIM WONJAE

KIM WARREN

KAGEL LAW PC

KAGEL INA P

KIM WONJAE AKA WARREN KIM

KAGLE LAW P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MILLER ADAM I.

SILVER MILLER

MILLER MILLER GERBER LLP

MILLER SILVER

MILLER ADAM ISAAC

MILLER ADAM I

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CURTIS B. SOK

SOK CURTIS B.

SOK CURTIS B

TORBETT JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

AMENUED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (2) RESCISSION OF CONTRACT (3) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT; ETC.

8/29/2018: AMENUED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (2) RESCISSION OF CONTRACT (3) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT; ETC.

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID C. SILVER

11/20/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID C. SILVER

Substitution of Attorney

10/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

9/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/24/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, ETC.

3/15/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, ETC.

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

2/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/31/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service - Proof of Electronic Service

10/30/2018: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service - Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of Service by Mail

10/31/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

10/31/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service -

10/10/2018: Proof of Personal Service -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • Hearing02/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Hearing01/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Hearing11/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hayan Charlton (Plaintiff); Chin Se Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of David C. Silver); Filed by Hayan Charlton (Plaintiff); Chin Se Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Kagle Law, P.C. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by David L. Kagel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by David L. Kagel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint for (1) Breach of Contract (2) Rescission of Contract (3) Fraudulent Inducement (4) Negligent Misrepresentation (5) Breach of Fiduciary Duty (6) Conversion (7) Civil Conspiracy (8) Breach of Contract; Filed by Hayan Charlton (Plaintiff); Chin Se Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketAMENUED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT (2) RESCISSION OF CONTRACT (3) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketSummons (Joint Debtor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hayan Charlton (Plaintiff); Chin Se Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708601    Hearing Date: January 16, 2020    Dept: 24

David C. Silver’s application to be admitted as counsel pro hac vice for Plaintiffs is GRANTED.

On June 29, 2017, Plaintiffs Hayan Charlston and Chin Se Kim (“Plaintiffs”) brought the instant breach of contract suit Defendants David Saffron, David Kagel, Kagel Law PC, Wonjae Kim, and Ina Kagel. The First Amended Complaint states eight causes of action for (1) Breach of Contract (2) Rescission of Contract (3) Fraudulent Inducement (4) Negligent Misrepresentation (5) Breach of Fiduciary Duty (6) Conversion (7) Civil Conspiracy and (8) Breach of Contract.

On November 20, 2019, David C. Silver (“Applicant”) filed the instant application to appear as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. No opposition was submitted.

CRC Rule 9.40 provides that an attorney in good standing in another jurisdiction may apply to appear pro hac vice in this State by way of written application upon due notice to all interested parties, as well as service on the State Bar in San Francisco with payment of a $50.00 fee, so long as that attorney is not a resident of California, does not work in California and does not perform regular or substantial business, professional or other activities in the State.

The written application must provide the following information: (1) applicant attorney’s residence and office addresses; (2) the courts to which the applicant attorney has been admitted and dates of admission; (3) a representation that the attorney applicant is a member in good standing in the courts of admission and is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court; (4) the title of each court and action in which the applicant attorney has appeared pro hac vice in this State in the preceding two years, if any; and (5) the name, address, and telephone number of the active California State Bar member who is counsel of record in the local action. (CRC Rule 9.40(d).)

The application satisfies rule 9.40. Applicant’s declaration supplied sufficient information to satisfy the requirements. (Silver Decl., ¶¶ 1-10.) Accordingly, the application is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.