This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 02:11:55 (UTC).

HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS LP VS HAWTHORNE AIRPORT LLC ET

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS LP filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against HAWTHORNE AIRPORT LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RITA MILLER and ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3210

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RITA MILLER

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS LP

HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS L.P

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HAWTHORNE AIRPORT LLC

MS KEARNY NORTHROP AVENUE LLC

ADVANCED AIR LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS L.P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

STEINBERG S. KEVEN ESQ.

STEINBERG S KEVEN

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL B. COOPER ESQ.

COOPER MICHAEL BRETT

STOCKTON KIRSTEN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS HAWTHORNE AIRPORT, LLC AND ADVANCED AIR, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS, LP.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPOR

8/2/2018: DEFENDANTS HAWTHORNE AIRPORT, LLC AND ADVANCED AIR, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS, LP.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPOR

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL COOPER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HAWTHORNE AIRPORT, LLC AND ADVANCED AIR, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS, L.P.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLA

8/2/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL COOPER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HAWTHORNE AIRPORT, LLC AND ADVANCED AIR, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS, L.P.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLA

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

ORDER RE PLAI1T1FF HAWTHORNE BANGAR OPERATIONS, LP.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: ORDER RE PLAI1T1FF HAWTHORNE BANGAR OPERATIONS, LP.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

Declaration

10/5/2018: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

10/5/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

10/15/2018: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

10/15/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

10/25/2018: Notice of Ruling

Order

11/15/2018: Order

Request for Judicial Notice

12/14/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

12/14/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

12/14/2018: Declaration

Motion for Summary Adjudication

12/14/2018: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Declaration

12/14/2018: Declaration

Other -

12/14/2018: Other -

Other -

12/14/2018: Other -

Request for Judicial Notice

12/19/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

235 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Order); Filed by Hawthorne Airport LLC (Defendant); Advanced Air, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Hawthorne Airport LLC (Defendant); Advanced Air, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Hawthorne Airport LLC (Defendant); Advanced Air, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 16; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: (Plaintiff's counsel, Defendants' Counsel, Cross-complainant's Counsel, and Cross-Defendant's counsel Failure to Appear for Final Status Conference set this date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial For A Period Of 45 To 60 Days; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Keven Steinberg And Exhibits) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 12:33 PM in Department 16; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Rhona S. Reddix, CSR #10807)

    Read MoreRead Less
341 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DECLARAIORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Air, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hawthorne Airport, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINBERG KEVEN