This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 10:51:28 (UTC).

HARWONO FNU, ET AL. VS SAXON TRANSPORT , INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 HARWONO FNU, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAXON TRANSPORT , INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1389

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FNU HARWONO

SUDJONO MELLY

Defendants

SARAN JAGDEEP

SAXON TRANSPORT INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARDANYAN RUBEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/20/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/1/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department G - Hon. Salvatore Sirnaeffective 12/09/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 03/15/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department A to Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 03/15/2023 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Department A to Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Harwono Fnu (Plaintiff); Melly Sudjono (Plaintiff); As to: Saxon Transport , Inc.a California Corporation (Defendant); Jagdeep Saran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department A Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Harwono Fnu (Plaintiff); Melly Sudjono (Plaintiff); As to: Saxon Transport , Inc.a California Corporation (Defendant); Jagdeep Saran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harwono Fnu (Plaintiff); Melly Sudjono (Plaintiff); As to: Saxon Transport , Inc.a California Corporation (Defendant); Jagdeep Saran (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARDANYAN RUBEN