This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 18:48:08 (UTC).

HARVINDER SIDHU VS RAMON CHAVARRIA

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 HARVINDER SIDHU filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMON CHAVARRIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7124

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIDHU HARVINDER

Defendant

CHAVARRIA RAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2024
  • Hearing10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harvinder Sidhu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Harvinder Sidhu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Harvinder Sidhu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Harvinder Sidhu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN