This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 00:29:02 (UTC).

HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA, CA, AN INCORPORATED AND POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA, CA, AN INCORPORATED AND POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4479

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

CITY OF SANTA MONICA CA AN INCORPORATED AND POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WELCH DAVID RYAN

MURAMOTO EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/8/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

2/8/2019: Summons

Minute Order

2/14/2019: Minute Order

Notice

2/13/2019: Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/21/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/4/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/21/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for 1.Temporary Restraining Order, and 2. OSC re Preliminary Injunction) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA, F...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF Harvest of Santa Monica's NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Ex Parte Application for: TRO & OSC re Prelim Injunction); Filed by HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HARVEST OF SANTA MONICA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELCH DAVID R. ESQ.