Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2020 at 01:23:23 (UTC).

HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY VS MELISSA PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against MELISSA PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0614

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GERARDO EDNA JOSEFINA

PEREZ MELISSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISCHER-REYES JENNA

Defendant Attorney

HILL GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/28/2020

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

12/11/2019: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

12/5/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/4/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/4/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/1/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/1/2019: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Hearing08/31/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Hearing07/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Melissa Perez (Defendant); Edna Josefina Gerardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Melissa Perez (Defendant); Edna Josefina Gerardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Melissa Perez (Defendant); Edna Josefina Gerardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILL GEOFFREY