This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 03:54:09 (UTC).

HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY VS FRIANT AND ASSOCIAT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2017 HARTFORD ACCIDENT INDEMNITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against FRIANT AND ASSOCIAT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8048

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants

BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES

WESTFALL COMMERCIAL FURNITURE INC

FRIANT & ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISCHER-REYES JENNIFER L.

Defendant Attorneys

VANDERFORD TY STEPHEN ESQ.

PRAMSCHUFER ANDREW GARRET

GHAEMI DORDANEH

CAMPBELL KEVIN DAVID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/13/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/29/2017: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

1/4/2018: Proof of Service

Minute Order

1/11/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER

1/19/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER

Minute Order

4/30/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/2/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF JENNA L. FISCHER-REYES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS

5/16/2018: DECLARATION OF JENNA L. FISCHER-REYES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OR IN THE ALIERNATIVE, EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS

5/16/2018: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OR IN THE ALIERNATIVE, EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS

5/22/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS

Minute Order

5/30/2018: Minute Order

RULING RE: MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

5/30/2018: RULING RE: MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/8/2018: COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/8/2018: DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/8/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Unknown

8/8/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

8/14/2018: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Cross-Complaint filed by Business Furniture Services); Filed by Business Furniture Services (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SUBROGATION TO RECOVER WORKERS COMPENSATION BENEFITS PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE 3852)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

o @ L) orcou

KEVIN D. CAMPBELL, ESQ. (State Bar No. 110271) swperord EED LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG A. HOLTZ County of Los Angoios 100 West Broadway, Suite 1150

Glendale, California 91210 NOV 3 G 2017 Telephone: 818-539-2120 | Sherti R. Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk Facsimile: 877-613-3298 By. Deputy

Jenny Chea

Attorneys for Defendant/Cross-Complainant/Cross-Defendant WESTFALL COMMERCIAL FURNITURE, INC.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY

COMPANY,

CASE NO.: BC648048

Assigned to: Hon. Michael J. Raphael Department: “51”

Plaintiff,

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT/CROSS- COMPLAINANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT WESTFALL COMMERCIAL

FURNITURE, INC. TO CROSS- COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT, CROSS-

COMPLAINANT AND CROSS- DEFENDANT BUSINESS FURNITURE

SERVICES.

FRIANT AND ASSOCIATES, INC., BUSINESS FURNITURE SERVICES; WESTFALL COMMERCIAL FURNITURE., INC.; and DOES 1 to 25, Inclusive,

Defendants.

) ) Action Filed: January 24, 2017

WESTFALL COMMERCIAL FURNITURE, ; Trial Date: None

INC., ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) )

Cross-Complainant, Vs.

FRIANT AND ASSOCIATES, INC., BUSINESS SERVICES, and ROES 1 to 30, Inclusive,

Cross-Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISCHER-REYES JENNIFER L.