This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 06:02:56 (UTC).

HARRY M. RUZGERIAN, ET AL. VS EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 HARRY M RUZGERIAN, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1754

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUZGERIAN HARRY M.

RUZGERIAN MARY J.

Defendants

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL INC. AND ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AS ALTER-EGO OF AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION AND HONEYWELL INC.

MEL?S AUTO SUPPLY

MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PARENT ALTER EGO AND EQUITABLE TRUSTEE TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

O?REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES LLC

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA LLC AKA AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST PARENT ALTER EGO AND EQUITABLE TRUSTEE OF THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. FKA VOLKSWAGEN OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEIRA MARTIN

RIVAMONTE IAN WILFRED A.

Defendant Attorneys

CALFO PAUL ANGELO

TAHERI ALEX G

SUGAPONG JACQUELYN J.

CONSOLO GABRIELLE H.

DUTTON HOLLY

HOWARD RAQUEL

MARTIN NICOLAS P

ONGARO DAVID R

WINTERMAN CRAIG LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) Honeywell International Inc.s Notice of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint

3/16/2023: Notice (name extension) Honeywell International Inc.s Notice of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint

Answer Answer of Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a/ AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint

3/16/2023: Answer Answer of Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a/ AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint

Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

3/16/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

3/15/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/15/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice (name extension) Notice of Change of Hearing

3/13/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Change of Hearing

Answer Defendant Morse Tec LLC, f/k/a Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, as Successor-by-Merger to Borg- Warner Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium; Demand

3/9/2023: Answer Defendant Morse Tec LLC, f/k/a Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, as Successor-by-Merger to Borg- Warner Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium; Demand

Answer Defendant Honeywell International Inc., for Honeywell Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injuries

3/9/2023: Answer Defendant Honeywell International Inc., for Honeywell Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injuries

Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from the California Department of Motor Vehicles and for A

3/9/2023: Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from the California Department of Motor Vehicles and for A

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from the C

3/9/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from the C

Separate Statement Plaintiffs Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from The California Department of Motor Vehi

3/9/2023: Separate Statement Plaintiffs Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from The California Department of Motor Vehi

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Ian A. Rivamonte in Support of Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from the California Department of

3/9/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Ian A. Rivamonte in Support of Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Subpoena for Production of Records from the California Department of

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Demurrer of Honeywell International Inc., To Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action For Fraud

3/6/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Demurrer of Honeywell International Inc., To Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action For Fraud

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action for Fraud

3/6/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Defendant Honeywell International Inc.s Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action for Fraud

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Raquel E. Howard in Support of Honeywell International Inc.s Demurrer to Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action for Fraud

3/6/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Raquel E. Howard in Support of Honeywell International Inc.s Demurrer to Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action for Fraud

Answer Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporations Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint For Personal Injuryand Loss Of Consortium

3/6/2023: Answer Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporations Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint For Personal Injuryand Loss Of Consortium

Answer

3/6/2023: Answer

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2023
  • Hearing08/30/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • Hearing04/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Defendant Honeywell International Inc.'s Subpoena for Production of Records from the California Department of Motor Vehicles and for a Protective Order for Plaintiffs (Ruzgerian-23STCV01754)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketHoneywell International Inc.s Notice of Withdrawal of Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint; Filed by: Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant); As to: Harry M. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); Mary J. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketAnswer of Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a/ AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant); As to: Harry M. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); Mary J. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketHearing - Other on Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Third Cause of Action for Fraud for Defendant Honeywell International Inc. (Ruzgerian-23STCV01754) scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Hearing; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Morse Tec LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees, Demand for Trial by Jury, and Estimate of Length of Trial; Filed by: Harry M. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); Mary J. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Harry M. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); Mary J. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); As to: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Defendant); Exxon Mobil Corporation (Defendant); Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harry M. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); Mary J. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); As to: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Defendant); Exxon Mobil Corporation (Defendant); Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Harry M. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); Mary J. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); As to: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Defendant); Exxon Mobil Corporation (Defendant); Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Preliminary Fact Sheet Personal Injury; Filed by: Harry M. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); Mary J. Ruzgerian (Plaintiff); As to: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Defendant); Exxon Mobil Corporation (Defendant); Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less