This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 00:12:31 (UTC).

HARRY HARTOUNIAN, , ET AL. VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 HARRY HARTOUNIAN, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6026

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARTOUNIAN CHARMAINE

HARTOUNIAN HARRY

Defendants

3M COMPANY

AUTOZONE WEST INC.

BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SERVICE SOLUTIONS INC.

CUMMINS INC.

DCO LLC FKA DANA COMPANIES LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

EATON CORPORATION

FMC CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY AKA NAPA AUTO PARTS

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC. AKA AMMCO TOOLS INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

MCCORD CORPORATION FKA MCCORD GASKET CORPORATION

MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC. AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES LLC FKA CSK AUTO INC.

PFIZER INC.

PNEUMO-ABEX LLC FKA AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE COMPANY FKA AMERICAN BRAKE SHOE AND FOUNDRY COMPANY INCLUDING THE AMERICAN BRAKEBLOC DIVISION FKA THE AMERICAN BRAKE MATERIALS CORPORATION

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN ERIC LOREN

HUANG AILEEN

DEBLASE PATRICK ANDREW

EYERLY MICHAEL C.

Defendant Attorneys

BARONIAN ROBERT HAIG

CALFO PAUL ANGELO

COGGSHALL WILLIAM L.

DONOHO TAYLOR N.

DUFFY JOSEPH

FOLEY PATRICK J

IRWIN GEORGE HUMPHRIES

JACKSON GABRIEL A.

LAVIGNA JENNA

MICARASET ANDREW

PEATMAN STEPHANIE GHANEM

NICHOLS STEPHEN M.

SCHATZ RUSS

WILLIAMSON IAN G.

TALARICO AMY J.

YOUNG IV ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT EATON CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO CUTLER-HAMMER INC.S TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/3/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT EATON CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO CUTLER-HAMMER INC.S TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - HENNESSY INDUSTRIES LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/6/2022: Answer - HENNESSY INDUSTRIES LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Answer - DEFENDANT MCCORD CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/6/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT MCCORD CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/6/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/6/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer - DEFENDANT FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC., INCORRECTLY NAMED AS FMC CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

6/16/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC., INCORRECTLY NAMED AS FMC CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS

6/17/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS

Answer - DEFENDANT PFIZER INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT PFIZER INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL DEFENDANT AUTOZONE WEST, LLC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

6/17/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL DEFENDANT AUTOZONE WEST, LLC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/17/2022: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEFENDANT AUTOZONE WEST, LLC.S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEFENDANT AUTOZONE WEST, LLC.S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Answer - ANSWER AUTOZONE WEST, LLC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

6/17/2022: Answer - ANSWER AUTOZONE WEST, LLC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

6/17/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AD ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

6/17/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AD ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

6/20/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/20/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL J

6/21/2022: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL J

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant); Morse Tec LLC (Defendant); The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer of Defendant DCo LLC to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages for Personal Injury; Request for Jury Trial; Filed by DCO, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by DCO, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDefendant Cummins Inc., (Erroneously sued as, "Cummins, Inc.")'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injuries and Loss and Consortium; Filed by Cummins, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDefendant Cummins Inc., (Erroneously sued as "Cummins, Inc.")'s Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Cummins, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket3M Company?s Answer to Plaintiffs? Complaint for Personal Injuries and Loss of Consortium; Filed by 3M Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Honeywell International Inc., F/K/A Alliedsignal Inc., Successor-In- Interest to The Bendix Corporation, to Plaintiffs? Complaint for Damages for Personal Injury); Filed by Honeywell International Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant The Pep Boys ? Manny, Moe & Jack Of California To Plaintiffs? Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos); Filed by The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hennessy Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketHennessy Industries LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by Hennessy Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by McCord Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDefendant McCord Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by McCord Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Eaton Corporation, individually and as successor to Cutler-Hammer Inc.?s to Plaintiffs? Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand For Jury Trial); Filed by Eaton Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Harry Hartounian, (Plaintiff); Charmaine Hartounian, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Harry Hartounian, (Plaintiff); Charmaine Hartounian, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Harry Hartounian, (Plaintiff); Charmaine Hartounian, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bosch Automotive Service Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE WEST, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant