This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 02:23:19 (UTC).

HARRY HARMIK BEGIAN, ET AL. VS ALLIANT INSURANCE GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 HARRY HARMIK BEGIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLIANT INSURANCE GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9034

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEGIAN HARRY HARMIK

DUARTE MAXIMINO PIMENTEL

Defendants

ALLIANT INSURANCE GROUP

ALLIANT INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ASPEN INSURANCE UK LTD.

ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY

BRIT GLOBAL SPECIALTY LONDON SYNDICATES

CHUBB EUROPEAN GROUP SE

ENDURANCE WORLDWIDE INSURANCE LTD/AS SOMPO INTERNATIONAL

EVANSTON INS. CO.

EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.

IRONSHORE EUROPE DAC

IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPAY

LANCASHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY UK LTD

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

LLOYD?S SYNDICATES

MARKEL-EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/14/2022: Complaint

Initial Status Conference Order

5/2/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 05/02/2022

5/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 05/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

5/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 1; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docketat 1:37 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Newly Filed Class Action;) of 05/02/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Harry Harmik Begian (Plaintiff); Debra S. Peart (Plaintiff); Maximino Pimentel Duarte (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Harry Harmik Begian (Plaintiff); Debra S. Peart (Plaintiff); Maximino Pimentel Duarte (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Harry Harmik Begian (Plaintiff); Debra S. Peart (Plaintiff); Maximino Pimentel Duarte (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANCASHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY UK LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Chubb European Group SE is a litigant

Latest cases where Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant