This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 17:00:20 (UTC).

HARRY B. KRAM, M.D. VS MEDPOINT MANAGEMENT; GLOBAL CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; BELLA VISTA MEDICAL GROUP, INC; HEALTH CARE LA, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 HARRY B KRAM, M D filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MEDPOINT MANAGEMENT GLOBAL CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC BELLA VISTA MEDICAL GROUP, INC HEALTH CARE LA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6644

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRAM M.D. HARRY B.

Defendants

BELLA VISTA MEDICAL GROUP INC.

MEDPOINT MANAGEMENT

GLOBAL CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

HEALTH CARE LA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FENTON HENRY ROBERT

MAIN SUMMER A.

Defendant Attorneys

NEUFELD TIMOTHY LEE

SHIKAI YURIKO MARY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE RETU...)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE RETU...)

Status Report

8/2/2021: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT OPTIONS)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT OPTIONS)

Notice of Ruling

4/13/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RULING, OSC RE SANCTIONS AGAINST HENRY FENTON, ESQ., AND CONTINUANCE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION

2/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RULING, OSC RE SANCTIONS AGAINST HENRY FENTON, ESQ., AND CONTINUANCE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMMENCEMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMMENCEMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAU...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF H FENTON AND R HSIEH

10/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF H FENTON AND R HSIEH

Notice of Ruling

7/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

7/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SETTING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SETTING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/15/2020: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request - REQUEST TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/9/2020: Request - REQUEST TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/11/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

1/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/26/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/26/2019: Complaint

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • Hearing10/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (as to why the case should not be return to Los Angeles Superior Court for trial proceedings) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: as to why the case should not be retu...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Medpoint Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (ON JULY 1, 2021 HEARING); Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Settlement Options) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Settlement Options)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketStatus Report (JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: JULY 1, 2021 CONFERENCE); Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff); Medpoint Management (Defendant); Global Care Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Harry B. Kram, M.D. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLA VISTA MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLOBAL CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDPOINT MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAIN SUMMER A.