Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 05:54:17 (UTC).

HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC. VS C.A. RASMUSSEN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C A RASMUSSEN, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0800

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC.

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

C.A. RASMUSSEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EMPIRE STEEL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERTOSSA BRIAN D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/1/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/1/2019: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/5/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons

6/5/2019: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HARRIS REBAR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A DIVISION OF HARRIS/ARIZONA REBAR INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CA Rasmussen, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERTOSSA, BRIAN D