This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 11:46:23 (UTC).

HARRIS L. WOODS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS E.H. BUTLAND CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 HARRIS L WOODS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against E H BUTLAND CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0225

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS L. WOODS ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

E.H. BUTLAND CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGEN SAMANTHA

Defendant Attorneys

GREIFINGER DAVID R.

HODGES RONALD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

5/14/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/10/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

11/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by E.H. Butland Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Antelope Valley Healthcare District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by E.H. Butland Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Antelope Valley Healthcare District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Harris L. Woods Electrical Contractor, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E.H. BUTLAND CORP., A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIGGEN SAMANTHA