This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2022 at 13:16:33 (UTC).

HARRIS FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED SEPTEMBER 5, 2013

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 HARRIS FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED SEPTEMBER 5, 2013 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0478

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Trustees

O'NEAL SHARNETTA

LOFTON ELVIN

WHITAKER ALLEN

Not Classified By Court

HARRIS FAMILY LIVING TRUST

Other

ST. MARK BAPTIST CHURCH

Interested Party

STAMATELATOS LA TISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Trustee Attorneys

VANLEESTEN ANDREA GOINS

LARSEN RYAN JAMES

Other Attorneys

BERK JILLIAN ALISE

ROSHAN BENAZEER

Interested Party Attorney

PERRYMAN MARK DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/14/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/14/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/14/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/23/2022: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Instruction regarding Trust Distribution Provisions

11/1/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Instruction regarding Trust Distribution Provisions

Withdrawal of Petition - Before First Hearing

3/15/2022: Withdrawal of Petition - Before First Hearing

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition to Determine Distribution Rights

3/24/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition to Determine Distribution Rights

Minute Order

3/25/2022: Minute Order

Request - Special Notice

3/25/2022: Request - Special Notice

Minute Order

3/25/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Rulings and Continued Hearings (Notices)

4/6/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Rulings and Continued Hearings (Notices)

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition for Orders 1. Compelling Trustee to Account 2. Removing Trustee and ...

5/6/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition for Orders 1. Compelling Trustee to Account 2. Removing Trustee and ...

Notice - Hearing

5/9/2022: Notice - Hearing

Objection - Trust Petition

5/27/2022: Objection - Trust Petition

Objection - Trust Petition - Preliminary Objection of St. Mark Baptist Church

5/27/2022: Objection - Trust Petition - Preliminary Objection of St. Mark Baptist Church

Objection - Trust Petition - to Petition for Orders: (1) Compelling Trustee to Account; (2) Removing Trustee and Appointing Successor...

5/31/2022: Objection - Trust Petition - to Petition for Orders: (1) Compelling Trustee to Account; (2) Removing Trustee and Appointing Successor...

Proof of Service - Proof of Service of St. Mark Baptist Church's Preliminary Objections to Beneficiaries Allen Whitaker and Elvin Lofton's Verified Petition to Determine Distribution Rights (Comment)

5/31/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service of St. Mark Baptist Church's Preliminary Objections to Beneficiaries Allen Whitaker and Elvin Lofton's Verified Petition to Determine Distribution Rights (Comment)

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Trust Contest

6/30/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Trust Contest

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketWithdrawal of Petition - Before First Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Benazeer Roshan in Support of St. Mark's Baptist Church's Demurrer to Petition for Instruction Regarding Trust Distribution Provisions (Declarations) ); Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (St. Mark's Baptist Church's Notice of Demurrer, Demurrer to Petition for Instruction Regarding Trust Distribution Provisions and Memorandum and Authorities (Comment) ); Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases; Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Instruction regarding Trust Distribution Provisions ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less