This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 19:48:02 (UTC).

HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. VS JUNE A. GROTHE CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JUNE A GROTHE CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9438

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS INC.

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

HONEYBEE FOODS CORPORATION

HOPEVALE PROPERTIES LP

JUNE A. GROTHE CONSTRUCTION INC.

MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER - WEST LLC

SOOD ENTERPRISES INC.

HONEYBEE FOODS CORPORATION DBA JOLLIEBEE USA

JUNE A. GROTHE CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA JG CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

9/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/11/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 08/18/2021

8/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 08/18/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/10/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 08/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HARPER ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HONEYBEE FOODS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JUNE A. GROTHE CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA J G CONSTRUCTION is a litigant