This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 00:26:21 (UTC).

HARPER, ALISHA VS VEGA, SATURNINO MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 HARPER, ALISHA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VEGA, SATURNINO MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHCART, PATRICK A., LIPNER, JOSEPH and BOXER, DOREEN B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1001

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CATHCART, PATRICK A.

LIPNER, JOSEPH

BOXER, DOREEN B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARPER ALISHA

Respondent

VEGA SATURNINO MARTINEZ

Others

JT POSEY CO 401K

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

FRIEDMAN ROBERT JAY

FRIEDMAN BRIAN ISAAC

Respondent Attorneys

GARCIA ANTHONY RAUL

ROMEO HEIDI HELENA

Other Attorney

BAUER ALEXANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (426-reviewed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 (Substitution of Payee ); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 83, Lipner, Joseph, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 83, Lipner, Joseph, Presiding; Request for Order - Other - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Order - Attend Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAUER ALEXANDRA