This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 15:53:03 (UTC).

HAROUTIOUN ASADOURIAN, ET AL. VS DAVID PECK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 HAROUTIOUN ASADOURIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID PECK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2677

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASADOURIAN ELIZABETH

ASADOURIAN HAROUTIOUN

Defendants

JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

PECK DAVID

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALOUSTIAN HARRY S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2024
  • Hearing11/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HAROUTIOUN ASADOURIAN (Plaintiff); ELIZABETH ASADOURIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HAROUTIOUN ASADOURIAN (Plaintiff); ELIZABETH ASADOURIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HAROUTIOUN ASADOURIAN (Plaintiff); ELIZABETH ASADOURIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant